skip to content

Vedova, Joseph Dalla

CPSO#: 18533

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 30-Jan-2019

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Naples, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Joseph D. Vedova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 7 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: Safe Store 2704 Hwy 20 Fonthill, ON L0S 1E6 Tel: (905) 892-0010
Date Received: 09 May 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:13 Nov 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1959
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012