skip to content

Veale, John Laurence

CPSO#: 23780

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Nov 1992
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 31 Oct 2004
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gaelic

Education:University of Dublin, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
38 Church Street South
Ajax ON  L1S 6B3
Phone: (905) 427-1445 Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:08 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 31 Oct 2004
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 23 Apr 2015

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 23 Apr 2015 Active
             As from October 31, 2004, Dr. John Laurence Veale agrees to the following as
            terms, conditions and limitations on his certificate of registration:

                  -     Dr. Veale may not engage in or be involved with the administering
                        or dispensing of methadone.