skip to content

Vause, Tannys Dawn Reiko

CPSO#: 85631

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Fertility Centre
Suite 200
955 Green Valley Crescent
Ottawa ON  K2C 3V4
Phone: (613) 686-3378 Ext. 623
Fax: (613) 225-9736 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: T Vause Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Vause ( CPSO# 85631 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Fertility Centre
Suite 200
955 Green Valley Crescent
Ottawa ON  K2C 3V4
Phone Number: (613) 686-3378

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 325-4619

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TANNYS DAWN REIKO VAUSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAUSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 02 Oct 2006 to 20 Oct 2006
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2006 to 15 Dec 2006
EL - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2010