skip to content

Vaughan-Neil, Edward Francis

CPSO#: 29928

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oxford University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
General Division
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 431-8106 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York Diagnostic and Cardiac
Centre
250 Marlee St
North York ON  M6B 3H7
Canada
Phone: (416) 783-0000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Mar 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:17 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective:16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EDWARD FRANCIS VAUGHAN-NEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAUGHAN-NEIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Feb 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1978