skip to content

Vatsya, Pracha Rohini

CPSO#: 90898

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Oct 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1075 Queen St W
CAMH (1051 Queen St W)
Crisis and Critical Care Building
D1 1236
Toronto ON  M6J 1H3
Phone: 4165358501 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Pracha Vatsya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Vatsya ( CPSO# 90898 )

Business Address:
CAMH
Suite 1140
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PRACHA ROHINI VATSYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VATSYA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014