skip to content

Vasudev, Pooja

CPSO#: 87216

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Delhi, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Room L222-5
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34249
Fax: 9055216192 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. POOJA VASUDEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VASUDEV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011