skip to content

Vasudev, Kamini

CPSO#: 94389

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 31 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Delhi, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 77507
Fax: (519) 667-6836 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kamini Vasudev Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Vasudev ( CPSO# 94389 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
800 Commissioners Road
A2 - 513
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:20 Jun 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2019 Active
             Dr. Kamini Vasudev may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.