skip to content

Vasudev, Akshya

CPSO#: 94388

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 31 Aug 2010
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Delhi, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Zone A Door 4-A2607
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 17078 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vasudev Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Vasudev ( CPSO# 94388 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
LHSC Victoria Hospital-Zone A Door 4
Suites A2 607
Department of Psychiatry
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective:16 May 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Psychiatry Effective:14 Nov 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2019 Active
             Dr.  Akshya  Vasudev  may  practise  medicine  independently  in psychiatry and
            geriatric psychiatry.