skip to content

Vasa, Priya Pradip

CPSO#: 90897

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Lawrence Health Centre
140 The Esplanade, 1st Floor
Unit 3
Toronto ON  M5A 4P5
Phone: (416) 864-6000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

59 Adelaide Street East
2nd floor
Toronto, ON
M5C 1K6
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Canada
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PRIYA PRADIP VASA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VASA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2012