skip to content

Varughese, Jobin Mathew

CPSO#: 94320

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen Square Family Health Team
Suite 201
366 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6V 1P8
Phone: (905) 455-1331 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Holland Christian Homes
7900 McLaughlin Road
Brampton ON  L6Y 5A7
Canada
Phone: (905) 459-3333
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jobin Varughese Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 4 2011
Corporation Name: Dr. Jobin Varughese Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Varughese ( CPSO# 94320 )

Business Address:
7900 McLaughlin Road
Brampton ON  L6Y 5A7
Phone Number: (905) 459-3333

Business Address:
Queen Square Family Health Team
Suite 201
366 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6V 1P8
Phone Number: (905) 455-1577


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Nov 2013 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 26 Oct 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2012 Active
 Dr.  Jobin  Mathew  Varughese  may  practise  medicine  independently in family
            medicine, only.