skip to content

Varty, Kimberly Margaret

CPSO#: 91097

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7217 Gelert Rd
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone: 705 457 1212 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

1260 Golf Links Rd
Thunder Bay
Fort William Family Health Team
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Canada
Phone: 807 626 1234
Fax: 807 623 8832
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Prettie Residence
955 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Canada
Phone: (807) 343-8361
Fax: (807) 346-7740
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

123 Marks St
Atikokan ON  P0T 1C0
Canada
Phone: 807 597 2721
County: District of Rainy River
Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kimberly Varty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Varty ( CPSO# 91097 )

Business Address:
Box 870
7217 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212

Business Address:
123 Marks Street
Atikokan ON  P0T 1C0
Phone Number: (807) 597-8781

Business Address:
Room UC 1007
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone Number: (807) 343-8188

Business Address:
Fort William Clinic
1260 Golf Links Clinic
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone Number: (807) 626-1234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY MARGARET VARTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARTY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011