skip to content

Varty, Christopher Bruce

CPSO#: 21375

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Jun 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact the hospital: Rouge Valley Centenary, 2867 Ellesmere Rd, Scarborough, ON, M1E 4B9 or via telephone at 416-284-8131.
Date Received: 12 Apr 2019

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 17, 2009
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
NOTICE OF SUSPENSION OF PRIVILEGES:

On December 2, 2008, Credit Valley Hospital notified the College that Dr. Christopher Bruce Varty's privileges were suspended, effective November 17, 2008.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:21 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019