Van't Spyker, Anthony Jacob (CPSO#: 99848)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5858
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Van't Spyker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Van't Spyker ( CPSO# 99848 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5507

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 18 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY JACOB VAN'T SPYKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN'T SPYKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2013