skip to content

Vanderlaan, Rachel Dawn

CPSO#: 98195

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Cardiac Surgery
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RACHEL DAWN VANDERLAAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERLAAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Dec 2019
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Mar 2020 to 31 May 2020
CF - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019