skip to content

VanderSpek, Susan Christine

CPSO#: 89091

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 May 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
4800 Leslie St.
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone: (647) 954-9954
Fax: (647) 954-9953 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Apr 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUSAN CHRISTINE VANDERSPEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERSPEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2011