skip to content

VanderBeek, Laura Eileen

CPSO#: 86380

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Front-385 St Paul Ave
Brantford ON  N3R 4N6
Phone: 5197531242
Fax: 5197534925 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Missisauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: 905-848-7100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Laura VanderBeek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. VanderBeek ( CPSO# 86380 )
Dr. M. Lanktree ( CPSO# 98461 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (416) 521-4099

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
385 St. Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N6
Phone Number: (519) 753-1242

Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 575-5743

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAURA EILEEN VANDERBEEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERBEEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012