skip to content

Vance, Alan Ross

CPSO#: 27427

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alan Vance Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 26 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: Ontario Document Storage (ODS) PO Box 2071 Sudbury , Ontario P3A 4R8 Phone: (705) 560-8461 Fax: (705) 524-8012 Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 26 Oct 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014