skip to content

Van Walraven, Michelle

CPSO#: 97861

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103B
190 Cundles Rd E
Barrie ON  L4M 4S5
Phone: (705) 735-0617
Fax: (705) 737-5766 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michelle Van Walraven Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Van Walraven ( CPSO# 97861 )

Business Address:
Unit 204
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 735-4944

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jan 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHELLE VAN WALRAVEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN WALRAVEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2015