skip to content

Van, Victor Bit Chun

CPSO#: 85345

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Medical Associates
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 0E3
Phone: (905) 873-3000
Fax: (905) 873-0800 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Victor Van Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Van ( CPSO# 85345 )

Business Address:
Georgetown Medical Associates
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 0E3
Phone Number: (905) 873-3000

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Halton Hills ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VICTOR BIT CHUN VAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008