Van, Ngoc Binh (CPSO#: 93752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Oct 2018

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
20B 600 Hespeler
Cambridge ON  N1R 8H2
Phone: (519) 267-2588
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ngoc Binh Van Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Van ( CPSO# 93752 )

Business Address:
51 Benton Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 3H1
Phone Number: (226) 240-3014

Business Address:
20B - 600 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 8H2
Phone Number: (519) 267-2588

Business Address:
580 Lancaster Street West
Kitchener ON  N2K 1M3
Phone Number: (519) 896-6699

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Feb 2015 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 2015
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 22 Oct 2018

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
member Effective: 22 Oct 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 22, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ngoc Binh Van, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Van to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of

                                    DR. NGOC BINH VAN
                                          ("Dr. Van")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
            ________________________________________________________________________

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Van, certificate of registration number 93752, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7216284 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my emergency medicine
                  practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Van, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   I, Dr. Van, undertake that I will not practise emergency medicine in any
                  jurisdiction until each of the following conditions have been met:

                  (a)   I provide the College with proof that I have successfully completed
                        the University of Toronto's Supplemental Emergency Medicine
                        Experience ("SEME") program.
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Van, undertake that upon my return to the practice of emergency
                  medicine, I shall, at minimum, submit to a reassessment of my emergency
                  medicine practice within six (6) months. 

            (8)   I, Dr. Van, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice
                  Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
                  Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a
                  copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A".  I also undertake to
                  abide by the College's "Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice
                  and/or Re-entering Practice" Policy, a copy of which is attached hereto
                  as Appendix "B". 

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (9)   I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to
                  emergency medicine practice, the ICR Committee may, among other things: 

                  (a)   request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
                  
                  (b)   request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
            (11)  I, Dr. Van, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of
                  this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
                        posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Van
                              engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in
                              the practice of emergency medicine.  In the face of these
                              allegations, Dr. Van has ceased to practise emergency
                              medicine in all jurisdictions until he completes the
                              University of Toronto's Supplemental Emergency Medicine
                              Experience ("SEME") program.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Van, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (17)  I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "C" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: October 22, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ngoc Binh Van to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective October 22, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Van engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of emergency medicine. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Van has ceased to practise emergency medicine in all jurisdictions until he completes the University of Toronto’s Supplemental Emergency Medicine Experience (“SEME”) program.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)