skip to content

Van, Hoa Ngoc Tuan

CPSO#: 90803

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CK Cardiac Imaging Centre
#1-180 McNaughton Ave West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone: (519) 354-6440
Fax: (519) 397-3061 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H Van Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Van ( CPSO# 90803 )

Business Address:
CK Cardiac Imaging Centre
180 McNaughton Avenue West
Suite 1
Chatham ON  N7L 4Z7

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:27 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HOA NGOC TUAN VAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014