skip to content

Van Heiningen, Willem Pieter Jan

CPSO#: 93537

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1180 Queen's Bush Road
PO Box 187
Wellesley ON  N0B 2T0
Phone: (519) 656-9025
Fax: (519) 656-9027 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

OHCOW
848 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1L9
Canada
Phone: (905) 549-2552
Fax: (905) 549-7993
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Region of Waterloo Public Health
2nd Floor
99 Regina Street
Waterloo ON  N2J3A8
Canada
Phone: (519) 883-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILLEM PIETER JAN VAN HEININGEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN HEININGEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 07 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2013