skip to content

Van Dorsser, John Gerard

CPSO#: 23727

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Mar 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: P O Box 40013, Charlotte P.O., Peterborough ON K9J 8R9
Date Received: 11 Mar 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 30 May 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Mar 2015

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 May 2012
Summary:

On May 30, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. John Gerard van Dorsser committed
an act of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the
profession. Dr. van Dorsser admitted the allegation.

Dr. van Dorsser is a general practitioner with a practice in Peterborough, Ontario. The following
deficiencies were identified in Dr. van Dorsser's care of patients:
Dr. van Dorsser failed to appropriately manage chronic, non-malignant pain by:
a) prescribing the short-acting narcotic Demerol over a sustained period of time to
Patient A;

b) prescribing the short-acting narcotic Demerol, both orally and by injection, for
several years to Patient B;

c) prescribing large doses and quantities of narcotics to Patient C, who was known to
have a substance abuse disorder and to be at significant risk of overdose because
of co-morbidities; and

d) prescribing narcotic medication to Patient D even though he was known to have a
substance abuse disorder.

Therefore, the Committee ordered and directed that:
1. the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. van Dorsser's
Certificate of Registration:
(a) Dr. van Dorsser shall not prescribe any drug that is:
(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the
Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); or
(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and
Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27).

(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of
Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached [to the Order] at Schedule "A"; and the
current regulatory lists are attached [to the Order] at Schedule "B");

(b) Dr. van Dorsser shall post a sign that is clearly visible upon entering his office(s)
in the form set out at Schedule "C" [to the Order]. For further clarity, this sign
shall state as follows: "Dr. van Dorsser is prohibited from prescribing Narcotic
Drugs, Narcotic Preparations and Controlled Drugs."; and

(c) Dr. van Dorsser shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and
patient charts and such other steps as the College may take for the purpose of
monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order.

2. Dr. van Dorsser pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within ninety (90)
days from the date of this Order.

3. Dr. van Dorsser appear before it to be reprimanded.
 
 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 30, 2012