skip to content

Van Doormaal, Curtis John

CPSO#: 97743

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia and Periop
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Alexandra Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
29 Noxon St.
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Canada
Phone: 519-485-1700
Fax: 519-485-9606
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Woodstock General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
310 Juliana Dr., Woodstock, ON
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
Phone: 519-421-4211
Fax: 519-421-4263
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. C. Van Doormaal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Van Doormaal ( CPSO# 97743 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
Department of Emergeny Medicine
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Business Address:
Alexandra Hospital
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 485-1700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Sep 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:15 Oct 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CURTIS JOHN VAN DOORMAAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN DOORMAAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 28 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2018 to 14 Jan 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 15 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2019 to 14 Jan 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 15 Jan 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2020 to 14 Jan 2021
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 15 Jan 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2021 to 14 Jan 2022
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 15 Jan 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014