skip to content

Van Dam, Darren John

CPSO#: 88639

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Middlesex Centre Regional Medical
Clinic
36 Heritage Drive, Box 160
Ilderton ON  N0M 2A0
Phone: (519) 666-1610
Fax: (519) 666-0281 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Van Dam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Van Dam ( CPSO# 88639 )

Business Address:
Middlesex Centre Regional Medical Clinic
Box 106
36 Heritage Drive
Ilderton ON  N0M 2A0
Phone Number: (519) 666-1610

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DARREN JOHN VAN DAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN DAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2011