skip to content

Van Bavel, Dirk John

CPSO#: 87999

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Melbourne, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 27 Feb 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 28 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008