skip to content

Valiulis, Aurelia Ona

CPSO#: 95565

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian

Education:Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
320 Adelaide St S
Prisma Health Care Collaborative
Unit B
London ON  N5Z 3L2
Phone: 519-878-8621
Fax: 519-913-4045 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Valiulis Cool Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cool ( CPSO# 95560 )
Dr. A. Valiulis ( CPSO# 95565 )

Business Address:
LHSC - Victoria Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (581) 685-8500

Business Address:
Suite 201
510 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6C 0B2

Business Address:
320 Adelaide St S
Unit B
London ON  N5Z 3L2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AURELIA ONA VALIULIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALIULIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2013