skip to content

Valiani, Sabira

CPSO#: 95796

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Feb 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Suleman, Sabira (used until: 18 Sep 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia
Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:27 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018