skip to content

Vali, Reza

CPSO#: 97095

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Oct 2014
EXPIRY DATE
14 Oct 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
Division of Nuclear Medicine
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Iran

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:15 Oct 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective:15 Oct 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 08 Mar 2012
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Radiology

University Of Toronto, 09 Mar 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Paediatric Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatric Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Oct 2014
CF - Pediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2014
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 14 Oct 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Oct 2014 Active
             1.    Dr. Reza Vali may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging, Division of Nuclear Medicine, University of Toronto, in
                        which Dr. Vali holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Vali  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Vali's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Vali's certificate of
                        registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on October 15, 2014.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on October 14, 2021.