skip to content

Valentino, Pamela

CPSO#: 92744

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:McGill University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 Apr 2014
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 07 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 2014