skip to content

Valente, Colleen Ruth

CPSO#: 97976

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Harbourview Family Health Team
Suite 301
1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A5
Phone: (807) 346-1240 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C. Valente Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Valente ( CPSO# 97976 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. COLLEEN RUTH VALENTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALENTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014