skip to content

Valeeva, Liliya

CPSO#: 98788

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Tashkent State Medical Institute, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2863 Ellesmere Rd
Unit 110
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 287 0990 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Valeeva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Valeeva ( CPSO# 98788 )

Business Address:
1808 - 360 Ridelle Avenue
Toronto ON  M6B 1K1
Phone Number: (647) 461-2544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LILIYA VALEEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALEEVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 May 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017