skip to content

Valdis, Matthew

CPSO#: 95567

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Sep 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3336
Fax: (519) 663-3496 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Valdis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Valdis ( CPSO# 95567 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW VALDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALDIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2018
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2019