skip to content

Vakilha, Mehrdad

CPSO#: 87730

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8 Greystone Walk Drive
Scarborough ON  M1K 5J2
Phone: (416) 266-5888
Fax: (647) 341-8880 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vakilha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vakilha ( CPSO# 87730 )

Business Address:
Suite C1D
8 Greystone Walk Drive
Scarborough ON  M1K 5J2
Phone Number: (416) 266-5888

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEHRDAD VAKILHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAKILHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 08 Oct 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2013