skip to content

Vakil, Anuradha Sridhar

CPSO#: 31432

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:Marathwada University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006