Vakharia, Nina Kalpesh (CPSO#: 99110)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Gujarat University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nina K. Vakharia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Vakharia ( CPSO# 99110 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L8M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NINA KALPESH VAKHARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAKHARIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 18 Oct 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015