skip to content

Vaishnav, Vandana

CPSO#: 87965

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Rajasthan University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S0A9
Phone: (647) 973-2025 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (647) 973-2025
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Vandana Vaishnav Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Vaishnav ( CPSO# 87965 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L6J 6T7
Phone Number: (647) 973-2025

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3

Business Address:
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4L8


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ireland
Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:09 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VANDANA VAISHNAV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAISHNAV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2016