skip to content

Vaidyanathan, Sammy

CPSO#: 94400

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 03 Feb 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 Feb 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sammy Vaidyanathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vaidyanathan ( CPSO# 94400 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  October 4, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On October 5, 2018, Humber River Hospital (HRH) notified the College, pursuant to s.85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Sammy Vaidyanathan has taken a voluntary one-year leave from his shifts and other duties at HRH, effective October 4, 2018.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 31 Jul 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 Aug 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 12 Sep 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 11 Nov 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 19 Dec 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 03 Feb 2020
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 25 Mar 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 04 Jan 2021

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Sep 2020
Summary:

On October 11, 2019 and January 9, 2020, allegations of Dr. Vaidyanathan’s 
 professional misconduct were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It 
 was alleged that Dr. Vaidyanathan engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional conduct; and failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
 profession in his care and treatment of patients. 
  
 The matter was heard on July 13, 2020 and September 23, 2020 by way of 
 videoconference, in the presence of counsel for the College and counsel for Dr. 
 Vaidyanathan. On the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission (Liability), 
 the Committee found that Dr. Sammy Vaidyanathan committed an act of professional 
misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; and failed to maintain the 
standard of practice of the profession. 
 
On January 4, 2021, the Committee released its decision on penalty, ordering and 
directing: 

   •  Dr. Vaidyanathan to attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
   •  The Registrar to suspend Dr. Vaidyanathan’s certificate of registration for a 
      period of twelve (12) months, commencing thirty (30) days after the date of this 
      Order.  
   •  The Registrar to place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. 
      Vaidyanathan’s certificate of registration 
   •  Dr. Vaidyanathan to pay costs to the College in the amount of $10,370.00 within 
      ninety (90) days from the date of this Order. 
 
The Committee’s full reasons for decision are now available on the College’s website. 
 
APPEAL 
On February 2, 2021, Dr. Vaidyanathan provided the College with a Notice of Appeal 
from the Committee’s Order.  
Dr. Vaidyanathan’s undertaking dated February 3, 2020 remains in effect and, pursuant 
to that undertaking, the Discipline Committee’s Order imposing terms and conditions is 
in effect, despite any appeal.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): July 13, 2020 and September 23, 2020 at 12:00 p.m.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 31, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Sammy Vaidyanathan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 31, 2019:

College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Vaidyanathan engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in prescribing, the practice of emergency medicine. As a result of the investigations:

Dr. Vaidyanathan will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.

Dr. Vaidyanathan will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping, test results management, and professional obligations and human rights.

Dr. Vaidyanathan’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

 

Source: Other
Active Date: February 27, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Sammy Vaidyanathan was found guilty of the following offence:

1. Care or control of a motor vehicle with over 80mg blood alcohol, contrary to Section 253(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

DATE: December 21, 2018
SENTENCE: 1 year driving prohibition; Fine of $1200.