skip to content

Nikore, Veena

CPSO#: 55015

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Aug 1986
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1986

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Delhi, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
484 West Street
Brantford ON  N3R 3W7
Phone: (519) 751-3604 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Veena Nikore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 14 2019
Corporation Name: Veena Nikore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Nikore ( CPSO# 22798 )
Dr. V. Nikore ( CPSO# 55015 )

Business Address:
484 West Street
Brantford ON  N3R 3W7
Phone Number: (519) 751-3604

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VEENA NIKORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIKORE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1986