skip to content

Manga Datta, Vaishaali

CPSO#: 100724

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Manga, Vaishaali (used until: 03 Sep 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
470 Hensall Circle
Mississauga ON  L5A 3V4
Phone: (905) 566-0555
Fax: (905) 566-5294 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Bay St,
Toronto ON  M5J 2J1
Canada
Phone: (416) 368-6787
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

9 - 6400 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 3E7
Canada
Phone: (905) 821-1406
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. V. Manga Datta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Manga Datta ( CPSO# 100724)

Business Address:
9-6400 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 3E7
Phone Number: (905) 821-1406

Business Address:
470 Hensall Circle
Mississauga ON  L5A 3V4
Phone Number: (905) 566-0555

Business Address:
Lower Concourse Level
200 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2J1


Corporation Name: Dr. V. Datta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Datta ( CPSO# 113763)
Dr. V. Manga Datta ( CPSO# 100724)

Business Address:
Oxford Medical Imaging
Suite 108
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2J 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 576-8760


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 15 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VAISHAALI MANGA DATTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANGA DATTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2013 to 25 Aug 2013
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015