skip to content

Kumari, Vandana

CPSO#: 95562

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 105
318 Spruce Street
Waterloo ON  N2L 0E9
Phone: (519) 7251111
Fax: 5197424308 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vandana Kumari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kumari ( CPSO# 95562 )

Business Address:
105 - 318 Spruce Street
Waterloo ON  N2L 0E9
Phone Number: (519) 725-1111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VANDANA KUMARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.