First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Apr 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Nov 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Sep 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 May 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2016 |