skip to content

Datta, Vikas

CPSO#: 113763

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Aug 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Temple University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oxford Medical Imaging
108 - 430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2J 3Z4
Phone: (519) 576-8760 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. V. Datta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Manga Datta ( CPSO# 100724)
Dr. V. Datta ( CPSO# 113763)

Business Address:
Oxford Medical Imaging
Suite 108
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2J 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 576-8760

Business Address:
2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2

Business Address:
Suite 202
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2

Business Address:
2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 21 Aug 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Feb 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2018

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2018 Active
             Dr. Vikas Datta may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.