skip to content

Uzoh, Chizoba Christopher

CPSO#: 111043

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 15 May 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Oct 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ibadan, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nigeria

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Nov 2016 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Oct 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Oct 2019
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 15 May 2020

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 15 May 2020


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 15 May 2020 Active

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 May 2020
Summary:

On May 14, 2020, on the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission, the 
    Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the 
   College) found that Dr. Chizoba Christopher Uzoh (Dr. Uzoh) committed committed an 
   act of professional misconduct under: 
    
-  paragraph 1(1) 33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93, in that he has engaged in an act or 
   omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
   circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
   dishonourable or unprofessional; and 
-   
-  paragraph 1(1)34 of O. Reg. 856/93, in that he engaged in conduct unbecoming a 
   physician. 
    
   Background 
    
   Dr. Uzoh is a 43 year-old family physician, who was first issued a restricted certificate of 
   registration in October 2016, and thereafter began practising in Etobicoke, Ontario.  
   Dr. Uzoh went to medical school in Nigeria. Before coming to practise medicine in 
   Ontario, Dr. Uzoh did specialty training, fellowships, and practised in the United 
   Kingdom, from 2005 to 2016.  
    
   Dr. Uzoh’s Failure to Notify College of Updated Information During the Application 
   Process  
    
   Dr. Uzoh applied to the College for a restricted certificate of registration as an exam-
   eligible candidate on April 11, 2016. Such a certificate of registration would permit him 
   to practise in Ontario for a specified duration under supervision while seeking 
   certification by examination from the College of Family Physicians of Canada. At that 
   time, he was still in practice in the United Kingdom.  
    
   Applicants are required to answer questions regarding professionalism, conduct, 
   character and suitability to practise medicine. Dr. Uzoh responded ‘no’ to the following 
   questions, which answer was true at the time, among others: 
    
•  Regardless of the outcome, have you ever been the subject of any complaint made to a 
   medical licensing authority? Be sure to disclose all complaints. Complaints that were 
   dismissed, or closed with no further action, or otherwise resolved in any manner, must 
   still be disclosed. 
•  Are you now the subject of any complaint made to a medical licensing authority?  
•  Have you ever been the subject of any type of investigation, inquiry or proceeding by a 
   medical licensing authority relating to your professional conduct, competence, capacity, 
   or any other aspect of your medical practice? Be sure to disclose all medical licensing 
   authority investigations, inquiries or proceedings, including any audits or assessments 
   of your practice.  
•  Are you now the subject of any type of investigation, inquiry or proceeding by a medical 
   licensing authority relating to your professional conduct, competence, capacity, or any 
   other aspect of your medical practice?  
•  Have you ever had a medical license revoked, suspended, restricted, limited, or 
   subjected to any other adverse action?  
•  Are you now or have you ever been the subject of any type of investigation, inquiry, 
   review or action by a hospital, health facility, or any other place of employment relating 
   to your professional conduct, competence, capacity, or any aspect of your medical 
   practice?  
    
   In his application, Dr. Uzoh agreed that during the course of his application, he would 
   immediately notify the College in writing of anything that rendered any response to the 
   questions in the application no longer true and complete, even if the response was true 
   and complete when originally given.  
    
   On May 11, 2016, the medical practice (the Practice) where Dr. Uzoh worked as a locum 
   in the United Kingdom received a complaint regarding Dr. Uzoh. Dr. Uzoh was notified of 
   the complaint. He was suspended for six months with immediate effect from the 
   medical performers list for the National Health Service England North, Cheshire and 
   Merseyside (the NHS), and notified of the same in writing by letter dated May 13, 2016. 
   The NHS informed the General Medical Council (the GMC) of the suspension on May 16, 
   2016, and on May 24, 2016 the GMC received information from the NHS setting out the 
   details underpinning the suspension.   
    
   By a decision dated May 31, 2016, and sent on that day to Dr. Uzoh via special delivery, 
   the allegations against Dr. Uzoh were referred to the United Kingdom’s Medical 
   Practitioners Tribunal (“MPT”). Dr. Uzoh was notified that an MPT Interim Orders 
   Tribunal hearing would be held on June 14, 2016.     
    
   On June 2, 2016, Dr. Uzoh confirmed that he had received the notice and emailed his 
   written representations to the Interim Orders Tribunal. Dr. Uzoh provided a response to 
   the allegations but advised that he would not attend the Interim Orders Tribunal.  
   On June 14, 2016, in Dr. Uzoh’s absence, the Interim Orders Tribunal imposed an interim 
   order of conditions for a period of 12 months on Dr. Uzoh. Dr. Uzoh was made aware of 
   the interim order in or around June 2016. 
    
   Dr. Uzoh did not notify the College of any of the foregoing, contrary to his obligation to 
   do so immediately, as these developments rendered his responses to the questions set 
   out at paragraph 4 above no longer true and complete. 
    
   On July 14, 2016, without having been notified by Dr. Uzoh of the new information, the 
   Registration Committee of the College considered and approved Dr. Uzoh’s application 
   for a restricted certificate of registration, subject to certain pre-conditions and 
    completion of any outstanding registration requirements. A letter from the Registration 
    Committee Chair to Dr. Uzoh dated July 18, 2016 advised him of this information.  
    Dr. Uzoh was issued a restricted certificate of registration on October 5, 2016, 
   permitting him to practise family medicine at a specified office in Toronto, Ontario 
   under supervision.  
    
   Dr. Uzoh’s Failure to Disclose Information on his Annual Renewal Form 
    
   On May 7, 2017, Dr. Uzoh completed his annual renewal form, which he was required as 
   a member to file with the College.  
    
   Dr. Uzoh was required to answer the following question on his annual renewal form: 
    
•  Are you registered with any other medical licensing authorities other than Ontario?  
   Dr. Uzoh answered this question in the negative. This was untrue. He remained licensed 
   in the United Kingdom.  
    
   Dr. Uzoh was also required to answer the following question on his annual renewal 
   form: 
    
•  Are there any discipline actions pending against you by any licensing 
   authority/regulatory, other than the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the 
   facts of which you have not previously disclosed to the College?  
    
   Dr. Uzoh answered this question in the negative. This was untrue. Dr. Uzoh had been 
   served with a Notice of Hearing by the MPT in April 2017, notifying him of a pending 
   MPT discipline hearing to be held in May 2017 regarding the allegations arising from the 
   patient complaint.  
    
   Dr. Uzoh’s Failure to Disclose Professional Misconduct Finding   
    
   On May 26, 2017, the MPT in the United Kingdom found Dr. Uzoh to have engaged in 
   misconduct and imposed an immediate order of suspension on Dr. Uzoh’s registration. 
   Dr. Uzoh received notice of the MPT’s finding and suspension order. 
   Members of the College are required to file a report in writing with the Registrar 
   regarding any finding of professional misconduct or incompetence made against them 
   by another body that governs a profession inside or outside Ontario, under section 
   85.6.3 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated 
   Health Professions Act, 1991. Such a report must be filed as soon as reasonably 
   practicable after the member receives notice of the finding.   
   Dr. Uzoh failed to file a report in writing with the Registrar regarding the MPT’s finding 
   as soon as was reasonably practicable. The College became aware of the investigation 
   and proceedings in the United Kingdom through media reports and a Federation of 
State Medical Boards disciplinary alert, and commenced an investigation regarding Dr. 
Uzoh on May 2, 2018.  
 
In his 2018 annual renewal form, submitted on May 8, 2018, Dr. Uzoh notified the 
College that he was licensed in the United Kingdom and had been subject to disciplinary 
action by a regulator other than the College.  
 
PENALTY 
 
The following additional facts were presented to the Committee with respect to penalty: 
 
Dr. Uzoh held a restricted certificate of registration that expired on October 4, 2019. 
Having attained the requisite qualifications by way of College of Family Physicians of 
Canada certification, Dr. Uzoh applied for an independent certificate of registration.  
 
Dr. Uzoh’s application for an independent certificate of registration was refused at a 
Registration Committee meeting held October 17, 2018, with reasons released January 
15, 2019. Dr. Uzoh sought review of the Registration Committee decision by the Health 
Professions Appeal and Review Board. The Registration Committee’s decision was 
upheld by the Board in an order and reasons released October 2, 2019.  
 
Dr. Uzoh does not currently have a certificate of registration with the College. Nor is Dr. 
Uzoh registered to practise in the United Kingdom any longer. 
       
Dr. Uzoh has advised that in January 2020 he began a one-on-one educational course in 
professional boundaries, ethics, and self-regulation with consultant Gail Siskind, which 
is ongoing. 
 
DISPOSITION 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered that: 
 
         -  Dr. Uzoh is to attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
     
         -  The Registrar is to suspend Dr. Uzoh’s certificate of registration for a 
            period of nine (9) months, commencing from May 15, 2020 at 12:01 a.m. 
       
         -  Dr. Uzoh is to pay costs to the College in the amount of $10,370, with 
            $5,185 thereof to be paid within sixty (60) days of the date of the Order 
            and the remaining $5,185 thereof to be paid within ninety (90) days of the 
            date of the Order. 
       
DECISION AND REASONS 

 

On July 9, 2020, the Committee released its full Decision and Reasons in this matter, available 
for review on the College’s website.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): May 14, 2020

Concerns

Source: FSMB
Active Date: May 26, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.
The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On May 26, 2017, the UK Medical Practitioners Tribunal found that Dr. Uzoh’s fitness to practise was impaired by his conduct, involving accessing medical records of a patient to obtain contact information and contacting the patient on a number of occasions for the purpose of pursuing a personal relationship. The Tribunal ordered that Dr. Uzoh’s registration be suspended for a period of 12 months. On June 5, 2018, the Tribunal reviewed Dr. Uzoh’s case and found that his fitness to practise remains impaired by reason of his misconduct and ordered that his registration be suspended for a further period of 12 months from June 28, 2018. The College was notified of this finding by a report on June 15, 2017 and by a further report dated July 19, 2018.