skip to content

Uy, Rhea Mae Locsin

CPSO#: 97646

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Med, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10424 Keele St
York Region Maple Health Centre LTC
Maple ON  L6A 2L1
Phone: 905-303-0133 Ext. 73600
Fax: 905-303-6038 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

10424 Keele Street
Maple ON  L6A 2L1
Canada
Phone: 905-303-0133 Ext. 78081
Fax: 905-762-1714
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

194 Eagle St
York Region Newmarket Health Centre
Newmarket ON  L3Y 1J6
Canada
Phone: 905-895-3628
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

246 Vellore Woods Blvd
MD Aesthetic & Health Services
Woodbridge ON  L4H 1Y5
Canada
Phone: 289-596-4777
Fax: 289-210-0407
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Uy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Uy ( CPSO# 97646 )

Business Address:
10424 Keele Street
10424 Keele Street
Maple ON  L6A 2L1
Phone Number: 905-303-0133

Business Address:
194 Eagle St
Newmarket ON  L3Y 1J6
Phone Number: 905-895-3628

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RHEA MAE LOCSIN UY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014