skip to content

Uy, Paul Gilbert

CPSO#: 95214

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Artists Health Centre
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto, Ontario
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-5263 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Uy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Uy ( CPSO# 95214 )

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5263

Business Address:
22 Vaughan Road
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 657-0379

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL GILBERT UY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2016