skip to content

Uy, Cassandra Leigh

CPSO#: 100517

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrews Dr
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: 9059029802 Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CASSANDRA LEIGH UY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018