skip to content

Utsalo, Vincent Aiyegbeni

CPSO#: 96957

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Feb 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calabar, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
12788 Highway 50
Unit 10
Bolton ON  L7E 4G1
Phone: (905) 857-9797
Fax: (905) 857-9791 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Vincent Utsalo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Utsalo ( CPSO# 96957 )

Business Address:
10 - 12788 Highway 50
Bolton ON  L7E 4G1
Phone Number: (905) 857-9797

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Feb 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VINCENT AIYEGBENI UTSALO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UTSALO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2014