skip to content

Uthayalingam, Sarangan

CPSO#: 91608

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Feb 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. George's University School of Medici, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Terrace Hill Paediatrics
217 Terrace Hill, Unit 128
Brantford ON  N3R 1G8
Phone: (519) 304 8882
Fax: 519 304 7880 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: (519) 752-7871
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Uthayalingam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 13 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:16 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARANGAN UTHAYALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UTHAYALINGAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2017