skip to content

Upadhyay, Amitkumar Shashikant

CPSO#: 89836

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Gujarat University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
15017 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1M5
Phone: (905) 727-4241
Fax: (905) 727-4288 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

535 Mulock drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y5H2
Canada
Phone: 9057274241
Fax: 9057274288
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Upadhyay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Upadhyay ( CPSO# 89836 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
15017 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1M5
Phone Number: (905) 727-4241

Business Address:
535 Mulock Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5H2
Phone Number: (647) 323-7546

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMITKUMAR SHASHIKANT UPADHYAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UPADHYAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2009